Bonk et al v. American States Insurance Company

Plaintiff: John W. Bonk and Donna M. Bonk
Defendant: Safeco Insurance American States Insurance Company
Undetermined: Mediator
Case Number: 3:2018cv02417
Filed: December 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: A Richard Caputo
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Daniel E. Cummins, Esquire (Mediator) added.Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 2/13/19. (dw)
February 11, 2019 Filing 10 Letter from Brigid Q. Alford to Judge Caputo re Agreement to Mediate Case. (Alford, Brigid)
February 5, 2019 Filing 9 Plaintiffs Reply To Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) With Affirmative Defenses by Donna M. Bonk, John W. Bonk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B)(Edley, Elliot)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 2/5/19. (dw)
January 17, 2019 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Safeco Insurance American States Insurance Company. (Alford, Brigid)
January 17, 2019 Filing 6 Defendants ANSWER to Petition for Removal to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Safeco Insurance American States Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1 thru 2)(Alford, Brigid)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order approving re #4 Stipulation. See Order for details. Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 1/15/19. (dw)
January 14, 2019 Filing 4 STIPULATION to Correct Defendant's Name, to Reflect Plaintiffs' Withdrawal, with Prejudice, of Paragraphs 25 & 27 of Complaint, and to Proceed to Early Mediation by Safeco Insurance American States Insurance Company. (Alford, Brigid)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint. Responsive Pleading due: 1/11/19. Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 1/3/19. (dw)
December 27, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Extension of Time to Uncontested Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to Complaint by Safeco Insurance American States Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Alford, Brigid)
December 21, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Safeco Insurance American States Insurance Company from Luzerne County, case number 2018-12995. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 4631194), filed by Safeco Insurance American States Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Table of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit(s))(bg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bonk et al v. American States Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John W. Bonk
Represented By: Elliot B. Edley
Represented By: Elliot B Edley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna M. Bonk
Represented By: Elliot B. Edley
Represented By: Elliot B Edley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeco Insurance American States Insurance Company
Represented By: Brigid Q. Alford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Mediator
Represented By: Daniel E. Cummins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?