Ivanitch v. Adelina's Restaurant

Plaintiff: Holly Ivanitch
Defendant: Adelina's Restaurant
Case Number: 3:2018cv02423
Filed: December 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: A Richard Caputo
Referring Judge: Joseph F Saporito
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr. (dw)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS #6 . The Report and Recommendation is ADOPTED and the Complaint #1 is dismissed. This matter is RECOMMITTED to Magistrate Judge Saporito for further proceedings, including screening of the Amended Complaint. Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 2/7/19. (dw)
January 28, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Adelina's Restaurant, filed by Holly Ivanitch.(ao)
January 14, 2019 Filing 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Complaint (Lodged with Motion for IFP) filed by Holly Ivanitch.For the foregoing reasons, it is recommended that:1.The plaintiffs complaint (Doc. 1) be DISMISSED for failure to state a claim, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii);2.The plaintiff be granted leave to file an amended complaint within a specified period of time following dismissal of the original complaint;3.The Clerk be directed to CLOSE this case if an amended complaint is not timely filed; and4.This matter be remanded to the undersigned for further proceedings, if any. Objections to R&R due by 1/31/2019Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 1/14/19. (ms)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; Complaint DEEMED FILED. Service shall be held in abeyance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 1/14/19 (ms)
December 26, 2018 Filing 4 STANDING PRACTICE ORDER sent to Pltf. (ao)
December 26, 2018 Filing 3 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED w/ Notice & Consent Form. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (ao)
December 21, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION (Application) for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Holly Ivanitch.(ao)
December 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Adelina's Restaurant lodged pending the disposition of the Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Holly Ivanitch. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ao)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ivanitch v. Adelina's Restaurant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adelina's Restaurant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Holly Ivanitch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?