Ivanitch v. Toys R' Us

Plaintiff: Holly Ivanitch
Defendant: Toys R' Us
Case Number: 3:2018cv02424
Filed: December 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
0 Judge: William I Arbuckle
1 Judge: Malachy E Mannion
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:427
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Toys R' Us, filed by Holly Ivanitch.(bg)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Granting Application to Proceed IFP. The complaint is now deemed filed. Plaintiff shall, if she chooses, file an amended complaint on or before the Thursday, January 31, 2019. Failure to file an amended complaint may result in the dismissal of this case.See Order for further details. Amended Pleadings due by 1/31/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge William I. Arbuckle on 12/28/18. (ch1)
December 26, 2018 Filing 4 STANDING PRACTICE ORDER Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 2/8/11. (ga)
December 26, 2018 Filing 3 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED. (ga)
December 21, 2018 Filing 2 Application To Proceed In District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. (ga)
December 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Toys R' Us lodged pending the disposition of the Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Holly Ivanitch. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ga)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ivanitch v. Toys R' Us
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toys R' Us
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Holly Ivanitch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?