Sands v. Kambouris Contruction et al

Plaintiff: William J Sands
Counter Plaintiff: Hristos Kambouris and Kambouris Contruction
Case Number: 3:2018cv02426
Filed: December 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
0 Judge: Malachy E Mannion
1 Judge: Karoline Mehalchick
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Approved. Judge Mehalchick assigned to case.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 2/14/19. (bs)
February 14, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE by William J Sands re #8 Order,,, Terminate Deadlines and Hearings,, Consent and Reference to Magistrate Judge (Mobilio, Matthew)
February 7, 2019 Filing 9 Notice, Consent and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge by Hristos Kambouris, Kambouris Contruction. . (Mulcahey, Danielle)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER The Court has reviewed the Joint Case Management Plan submitted on February 6, 2019. (Doc. 7). Within the plan, the parties have consented to the jurisdiction of a United States Magistrate Judge. Therefore the Case Management Conference scheduled for February 14, 2019 is CANCELLED. The Clerk is directed to send the appropriate consent form to counsel. The consent form shall be completed and filed with the court on or before February 11, 2019. Upon receipt the case will be reassigned to a United States Magistrate Judge who will reschedule the case management conference.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 2/6/19. (Attachments: #1 Consent form)(bs)
February 6, 2019 Filing 7 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN (JOINT) by William J Sands. (Mobilio, Matthew)
January 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryann D Loftus on behalf of Hristos Kambouris, Kambouris Contruction. (Loftus, Ryann)
January 20, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #2 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by William J Sands.(Mobilio, Matthew)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 2/14/2019 02:30 PM before Honorable Malachy E Mannion.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 1/3/19. (bs)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 12/27/18. (bs)
December 27, 2018 Filing 2 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against William J Sands by Kambouris Contruction, Hristos Kambouris.(Mulcahey, Danielle)
December 21, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Kambouris Contruction, Hristos Kambouris from Court of Common Pleas of Carbon County, case number 18-cv-3423. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 4631565), filed by Kambouris Contruction, Hristos Kambouris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ga)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sands v. Kambouris Contruction et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter plaintiff: Hristos Kambouris
Represented By: Danielle M. Mulcahey
Represented By: Ryann D. Loftus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter plaintiff: Kambouris Contruction
Represented By: Danielle M. Mulcahey
Represented By: Ryann D. Loftus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William J Sands
Represented By: Matthew Mobilio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?