BERTHE v. KLEISER et al
Plaintiff: SIDI MOHAMEDE BERTHE
Defendant: Deputy Warden Michael Buono, Darren Miller, Capt. Martin, KLUGER FRANK, GHEW KLEISER, BEA MAY, Sunny, OFFICER ROBERT HUDOCK and OFFICER HARE
Case Number: 3:2018cv02454
Filed: December 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: EBC
Referring Judge: James M Munley
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Civil Rights (Prison Conditions)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DISMISSING CASE as plaintiff has neither filed the proper IFP forms or submitted the filing fee. Signed by Honorable James M. Munley on 2/15/19. (sm)
February 13, 2019 Filing 9 Mail Returned as to SIDI MOHAMEDE BERTHE for the second time re #6 30 Day Administrative Order. Forwarding address not availible in Inmate Locator, document not being remailed. (bg)
January 25, 2019 Filing 8 Mail Returned as to SIDI MOHAMEDE BERTHE re #6 Order - 30 Day Administrative Order. Document remailed with inmate number on line two of address label. (bg)
January 2, 2019 Filing 6 THIRTY (30) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER directing the prisoner to pay the filing fee or file a completed and signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed. Signed by LP on 01/02/2019. (Attachments: #1 IFP (civil rights))(lp)
December 31, 2018 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:18-cv-05554. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO TRANSFER FORTHWITH THE ABOVE CAPTIONED CASE TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT FOR THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF PENNSLYVANIA. THE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS SHALL BE LEFT TO THE DISCRETION OF THE TRANSFEREE COURT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 12/27/18. 12/28/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE.(ti, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/31/2018.]
December 26, 2018 Filing 3 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (ahf) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/31/2018.]
December 26, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT LODGED WITH IFP against MICHAEL BUONO, KLUGER FRANK, HARE, ROBERT HUDOCK, GHEW KLEISER, MARTIN, BEA MAY, DARREN MILLER, SUNNY, filed by SIDI MOHAMEDE BERTHE. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ahf) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/31/2018.] Modified on 12/31/2018 (ep).
December 26, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS FILED BY SIDI MOHAMEDE BERTHE.(ahf) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/31/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BERTHE v. KLEISER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Warden Michael Buono
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darren Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capt. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KLUGER FRANK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GHEW KLEISER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BEA MAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICER ROBERT HUDOCK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICER HARE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SIDI MOHAMEDE BERTHE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?