Brown v. Gildea et al

Plaintiff: Gartor Kiki Brown
Defendant: CO John Doe, CO/DR Hill, Jr., Lt. Gildea, CO Harris, Lt. Snyder and Sgt. Zimmerment
Case Number: 3:2019cv00057
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: EBC
Referring Judge: James M Munley
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2019 Filing 11 Waiver of Service forms (AO 398 and 399) with Doc. 1 and Order dtd 3/7/19 Mailed to Gildea, Harris, Hill, Jr, Snyder, Zimmerment. CO John Doe NOT SERVED. Waiver of Service due by 4/8/2019. (ao)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DIRECTING THE CLERK'S OFFICE TO SEND AO 398 AND 399 WAIVERS FORMS to defendants along with this Order and Doc. 1. Pltf's #2 #7 Motions for Leave to Proceed ifp are granted. See Order for details. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to send a copy odf this Order to the Superintendent/Warden. The Complaint is DEMMED filed. Signed by Honorable James M. Munley on 3/7/19. (ao)
February 25, 2019 Filing 9 REQUEST for Status of Case by Gartor Kiki Brown. (ga)
February 1, 2019 Filing 8 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Gartor Kiki Brown. (lh)
January 31, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Gartor Kiki Brown.(lh)
January 15, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED UPDATED THIRTY (30) ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER directing the prisoner to pay the filing fee or file a signed UPDATED Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed. Signed by LP on 01/15/2019. The updated form is attached. (Attachments: #1 IFP (Civil Rights)) (lp)
January 11, 2019 Filing 5 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED w/ Notice & Consent Form. (Attachments: #1 AO 85 FORM) (lh)
January 10, 2019 Filing 4 STANDING PRACTICE ORDER sent to prisoner. (Attachments: #1 forms)(lh)
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 PRISONER AUTHORIZATION by Gartor Kiki Brown allowing prison to submit copy of prisoner's trust fund account to the court, and approving the entire filing fee to be deducted from prisoner inmate account.. (lh)
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Gartor Kiki Brown.(lh)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants lodged pending the disposition of the Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Gartor Kiki Brown.(lh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Gildea et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO/DR Hill, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Gildea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Zimmerment
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gartor Kiki Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?