Kennedy v. Casey et al
Plaintiff: Edward Thomas Kennedy
Defendant: County of Schuylkill Pennsylvania and Maria Casey
Case Number: 3:2019cv00067
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: William I Arbuckle
Referring Judge: Malachy E Mannion
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Change of Address by Edward Thomas Kennedy (Kennedy, Edward)
January 30, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE by Edward Thomas Kennedy re #9 Order on Motion to Compel and Objection and Certificate of Service (Kennedy, Edward)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying #8 Motion to Compel. See Order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge William I. Arbuckle on 1/28/19 (ch1)
January 25, 2019 Filing 8 First MOTION to Compel MOTION TO COMPEL SERVICE OF PROCESS by Edward Thomas Kennedy. (Attachments: #1 Memo MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL SERVICE OF PROCESS, and Certificate of Service)(Kennedy, Edward)
January 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by Edward Thomas Kennedy re #5 Letter NOTICE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL SERVICE OF PROCESS (Kennedy, Edward)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying #3 Motion for Authorization to File Electronically. The process of ECF registration does not require a court order. IT IS ORDERED THAT: Plaintiff shall complete an ECF Registration Form and email the completed form to ecfreg@pamd.uscourts.gov. The Clerks office is directed to include the ECF Registration form with this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge William I. Arbuckle on 1/18/19 (Attachments: #1 ECF Registration Form) (ch1)
January 16, 2019 Filing 5 Letter from Edward Kennedy re: USM 285 forms. (lh)
January 11, 2019 Filing 4 STANDING PRACTICE ORDER and pro se letter sentt o Edward Kennedy. (lh)
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Authorization to file electronically by Edward Thomas Kennedy.(lh)
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Edward Thomas Kennedy.(lh)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Lodged with Motion for IFP) against Maria Casey, County of Schuylkill Pennsylvania, filed by Edward Thomas Kennedy. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(lh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kennedy v. Casey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Schuylkill Pennsylvania
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Casey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Thomas Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?