Bartlow v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurace Company

Plaintiff: Shaun Bartlow
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurace Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00074
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: A Richard Caputo
Referring Judge: Robert D Mariani
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurace Company.(Drakas, Gary)
February 5, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION to Amend Complaint by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurace Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Stipulated Order)(Drakas, Gary)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 2/5/19. (dw)
January 30, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurace Company, filed by Shaun Bartlow. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A - State Farm Policy)(Abrahamsen, Edwin)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurace Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Exhibit(s) B - Release, #3 Exhibit(s) C - State Farm Letter, #4 Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Nonconcurrence)(Drakas, Gary)
January 11, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: This case has been assigned to Judge Caputo. (dmn)
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurace Company. (bg)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurace Company from Luzerne County, case number 2018-13737. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 4645692), filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurace Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(bg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bartlow v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurace Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurace Company
Represented By: Gary A. Drakas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaun Bartlow
Represented By: Edwin A. Abrahamsen, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?