Pivtchev v. State Farm Mutual Auto Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Tami Pivtchev
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Auto Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00150
Filed: January 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: James M Munley
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2019 Filing 12 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Tami Pivtchev. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Pl's Response to Def Motion to Dismiss)(Scartelli, Melissa)
February 28, 2019 Filing 11 REPLY BRIEF re #3 MOTION to Remand and Response to Defendant's Notice of Removal filed by Tami Pivtchev.(Scartelli, Melissa)
February 26, 2019 Filing 10 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by State Farm Mutual Auto Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) B - State Farm Correspondence)(Drakas, Gary)
February 21, 2019 Filing 9 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #3 MOTION to Remand and Response to Defendant's Notice of Removal filed by State Farm Mutual Auto Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Schlegel v. SF Opinion, #2 Exhibit(s) B - State Farm Affidavit, #3 Exhibit(s) C - Email Exchange)(Drakas, Gary)
February 21, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED DOCUMENT by State Farm Mutual Auto Insurance Company. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Exhibit(s) B - Sheriff's Return of Service)(Drakas, Gary)
February 20, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by State Farm Mutual Auto Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, #2 Proposed Order)(Drakas, Gary)
February 15, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE by Tami Pivtchev to #2 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Scartelli, Melissa)
February 12, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against State Farm Mutual Auto Insurance Company, filed by Tami Pivtchev.(Scartelli, Melissa)
February 7, 2019 Filing 4 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #3 MOTION to Remand and Response to Defendant's Notice of Removal filed by Tami Pivtchev.(Scartelli, Melissa)
February 7, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Remand and Response to Defendant's Notice of Removal by Tami Pivtchev.(Scartelli, Melissa)
February 1, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by State Farm Mutual Auto Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Proposed Order)(Drakas, Gary)
January 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Mutual Auto Insurance Company from Luzerne, case number 2016-14490. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0314-4657579), filed by State Farm Mutual Auto Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(lh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pivtchev v. State Farm Mutual Auto Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tami Pivtchev
Represented By: Melissa A. Scartelli
Represented By: Peter Paul Olszewski, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Auto Insurance Company
Represented By: Gary A. Drakas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?