Hordis et al v. Cabot Oil & Gas Corporation

Plaintiff: Hordis Family Cabot, LP, Victoria Hordis and Robert Hordis
Defendant: Cabot Oil & Gas Corporation
Case Number: 3:2019cv00296
Filed: February 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: A Richard Caputo
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint,, by Cabot Oil & Gas Corporation.(Barrette, Amy)
March 12, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Cabot Oil & Gas Corporation, filed by Victoria Hordis, Robert Hordis, Hordis Family Cabot, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Exhibit(s) F, #7 Exhibit(s) G, #8 Exhibit(s) H, #9 Exhibit(s) I, #10 Exhibit(s) J, #11 Exhibit(s) K, #12 Exhibit(s) L, #13 Exhibit(s) M, #14 Exhibit(s) N, #15 Exhibit(s) O, #16 Exhibit(s) P, #17 Exhibit(s) Q, #18 Exhibit(s) R, #19 Exhibit(s) S)(Jones, Robert)
March 11, 2019 Filing 7 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Matthew C. Pilsner, Esq.Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 3/11/19. (dw)
March 7, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Cabot Oil & Gas Corporation on 2/28/19, filed by Robert Hordis, Victoria Hordis, Hordis Family Cabot, LP. (Morahan, Zachary)
March 6, 2019 Filing 5 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Matthew C Pilsner on behalf of Cabot Oil & Gas Corporation Attorney Matthew Pilsner is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4692771.. (Pilsner, Matthew)
March 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Cabot Oil & Gas Corporation DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 (Barrette, Amy)
March 4, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy L. Barrette on behalf of Cabot Oil & Gas Corporation (Barrette, Amy)
February 21, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (ga)
February 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cabot Oil & Gas Corporation ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 4679926), filed by Victoria Hordis, Robert Hordis, Hordis Family Cabot, LP. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s) A, #3 Exhibit(s) B, #4 Exhibit(s) C, #5 Exhibit(s) D, #6 Exhibit(s) E, #7 Exhibit(s) F, #8 Exhibit(s) G, #9 Exhibit(s) H, #10 Exhibit(s) I, #11 Exhibit(s) J, #12 Exhibit(s) K, #13 Exhibit(s) L, #14 Exhibit(s) M, #15 Exhibit(s) N, #16 Exhibit(s) O, #17 Exhibit(s) P, #18 Exhibit(s) Q, #19 Exhibit(s) R, #20 Exhibit(s) S)(ga)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hordis et al v. Cabot Oil & Gas Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hordis Family Cabot, LP
Represented By: Robert R Jones
Represented By: Zachary D. Morahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Hordis
Represented By: Robert R Jones
Represented By: Zachary D. Morahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Hordis
Represented By: Robert R Jones
Represented By: Zachary D. Morahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cabot Oil & Gas Corporation
Represented By: Matthew C Pilsner
Represented By: Amy L. Barrette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?