Monaco et al v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Pasquale J. Monaco and Erin E. Colby
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00299
Filed: February 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Robert D Mariani
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2019 Filing 7 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) B - State Farm Correspondence)(Drakas, Gary)
March 8, 2019 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE REPORT by Erin E. Colby, Pasquale J. Monaco by Erin E. Colby, Pasquale J. Monaco.(Lombardo, Michael)
March 8, 2019 Filing 5 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM w/ COS filed by Erin E. Colby, Pasquale J. Monaco. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Lombardo, Michael)
February 28, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Plaintiffs' Complaint, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Nonconcurrence)(Drakas, Gary)
February 26, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 2/26/19. (jam)
February 21, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (ep)
February 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company from Court of Common Pleas for Luzerne County, case number 2019-275. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 4680746), filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ep)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Monaco et al v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Gary A. Drakas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pasquale J. Monaco
Represented By: Michael A. Lombardo, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erin E. Colby
Represented By: Michael A. Lombardo, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?