Messenger v. Cabot Oil & Gas Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Michael Messenger
Defendant: Carrie's Transport & Rental, LLC, Cabot Oil & Gas Corporation and Herbert H. Swiney
Case Number: 3:2019cv00308
Filed: February 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Malachy E Mannion
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Extend Time for deft. Cabot Oil & Gas to respond to complaint. Response due 5/13/19.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 4/17/19 (bs)
April 12, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Response to the Verified Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial by Cabot Oil & Gas Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Concurrence, #2 Proposed Order)(Barrette, Amy)
March 26, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Messenger. Cabot Oil & Gas Corporation served on 3/14/2019, answer due 4/4/2019. (Murthy, Angeli)
March 19, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily E. Mahler on behalf of Carrie's Transport & Rental, LLC, Herbert H. Swiney (Mahler, Emily)
March 13, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Michael Messenger. Herbert H. Swiney waiver sent on 3/12/2019, answer due 5/13/2019. (Murthy, Angeli)
March 13, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Michael Messenger. Carrie's Transport & Rental, LLC waiver sent on 3/12/2019, answer due 5/13/2019. (Murthy, Angeli)
February 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Michael Messenger (of Consent to Join) (Murthy, Angeli)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 2/25/19. (bs)
February 22, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Cabot Oil & Gas Corporation, Carrie's Transport & Rental, LLC, Herbert H. Swiney and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (ao)
February 22, 2019 Filing 2 EXHIBITS by Michael Messenger re #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) B)(ao)
February 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cabot Oil & Gas Corporation, Carrie's Transport & Rental, LLC, Herbert H. Swiney ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4681947), filed by Michael Messenger. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ao)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Messenger v. Cabot Oil & Gas Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Messenger
Represented By: Angeli Murthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrie's Transport & Rental, LLC
Represented By: Emily E. Mahler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cabot Oil & Gas Corporation
Represented By: Amy L. Barrette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herbert H. Swiney
Represented By: Emily E. Mahler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?