Williams v. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Kisha Williams
Defendant: UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 3:2019cv00333
Filed: February 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: A Richard Caputo
Referring Judge: Robert D Mariani
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 4/25/19. (dw)
April 9, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Kisha Williams. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America waiver sent on 3/29/2019, answer due 5/28/2019. (Abrahamsen, Edwin)
March 18, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kisha Williams. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America served on 3/5/2019, answer due 3/26/2019. (Abrahamsen, Edwin)
February 27, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: This case has been assigned to Judge Caputo (jw)
February 27, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to UNUM Life Insurance Company of America and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (ao)
February 27, 2019 Filing 2 EXHIBITS by Kisha Williams re #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 2, #2 Exhibit(s) 3)(ao)
February 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNUM Life Insurance Company of America ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4686149), filed by Kisha Williams. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ao)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kisha Williams
Represented By: Edwin A. Abrahamsen, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?