Adams Outdoor Advertising L.P. v. RPM Realty Company et al

Plaintiff: Adams Outdoor Advertising L.P.
Defendant: Ray Price MZ Motors, Inc., Ray Price Motors, Inc., Ray Price Ford Sales, Inc., Ray Price Ford, Inc., Ray Price Motors Co., Raymond Price, III, Ray Price Mount Pocono Motors, Inc., RPM Realty Company, Ray Price Motors Imports, Inc., Ray Price Chevrolet, Inc. and Ray Price Mount Pocono Ford Sales, Inc.
Undetermined: Mediator
Case Number: 3:2019cv00366
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Malachy E Mannion
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Stay response deadlines until after mediation is concluded and by further order of court.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 3/26/19 (bs)
March 22, 2019 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Deadline for Defendants' Response to Complaint by RPM Realty Company, Raymond Price, III. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Stipulated Order)(Geiger, Gerard)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Joseph Anthony Barrett for Mediator added.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 3/22/19. (bs)
March 22, 2019 Filing 7 Letter from Gerard J. Geiger, Esq. requesting phone conference to discuss mediation. (Geiger, Gerard)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 3/11/19. (bs)
March 6, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by RPM Realty Company, Raymond Price, III. RPM Realty Company waiver sent on 3/1/2019, answer due 4/30/2019; Raymond Price, III waiver sent on 3/1/2019, answer due 4/30/2019. (Geiger, Gerard)
March 6, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Gerard J. Geiger on behalf of RPM Realty Company, Raymond Price, III (Geiger, Gerard)
March 1, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Attorney for Plaintiff has been added. (ga)
March 1, 2019 Filing 3 Summons RE-Issued as to All Defendants and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (ga) Modified on 3/1/2019 (ga).
March 1, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (ga)
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 4689270), filed by Adams Outdoor Advertising L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s) A, #3 Exhibit(s) B, #4 Exhibit(s) C, #5 Exhibit(s) D, #6 Exhibit(s) E)(ga)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adams Outdoor Advertising L.P. v. RPM Realty Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Price MZ Motors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Price Motors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Price Ford Sales, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Price Ford, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Price Motors Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Price, III
Represented By: Gerard J. Geiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Price Mount Pocono Motors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RPM Realty Company
Represented By: Gerard J. Geiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Price Motors Imports, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Price Chevrolet, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Price Mount Pocono Ford Sales, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adams Outdoor Advertising L.P.
Represented By: James L Pfeiffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Mediator
Represented By: Joseph Anthony Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?