Benyo v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Brian Benyo
Defendant: Nancy Berryhill
Case Number: 3:2019cv00392
Filed: March 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Malachy E Mannion
Referring Judge: Karoline Mehalchick
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brian Benyo. Nancy Berryhill served on 4/24/2019, answer due 6/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of service by pro se plaintiff)(Friedman, F.)
March 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by F. Michael Friedman on behalf of Brian Benyo (Friedman, F.)
March 18, 2019 Filing 4 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to Asst. Atty. General, U.S. Attorney and SSA on 3/18/19 #1 Complaint Acknowledgement filed by Brian Benyo. (ga)
March 18, 2019 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by Brian Benyo.. (cl)
March 7, 2019 Receipt of payment from ANDREW G. BENYO in the amount of $400.00 for CIVIL FILING FEE. Transaction posted on 3/6/2019. Receipt number 333064711 processed by aoswald. (jjs, )
March 6, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Nancy Berryhill and provided TO ATTORNEY VIA U.S. MAIL for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (bg)
March 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nancy Berryhill ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 333064711), filed by Brian Benyo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt)(bg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Benyo v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Benyo
Represented By: F. Michael Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?