Pepper et al v. Covington
Plaintiff: Phillip S. Pepper and Kaylin L. Clinton
Defendant: Timothy J. Covington
Case Number: 3:2019cv00758
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: A Richard Caputo
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend by Kaylin L. Clinton, Phillip S. Pepper.(Scanlon, James)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry). Plaintiffs are given leave to file an amended complaint within 21 days from the date of entry of this Order. If Plaintiffs fail to do so, the action will be dismissed. Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 5/31/19. (dw)
May 31, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry).Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 5/31/19. (dw)
May 17, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Timothy J. Covington. Timothy J. Covington waiver sent on 5/17/2019, answer due 7/16/2019. (Anders, Marshall)
May 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Marshall E Anders on behalf of Timothy J. Covington. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Anders, Marshall)
May 6, 2019 Receipt of payment from RIDLEY CHUFF KOSIEROWSKI in the amount of $400.00 for CIVIL FILING FEE. Transaction posted on 5/3/2019. Receipt number 333065615 processed by epetrosk. (tp)
May 3, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Timothy J. Covington and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (ao)
May 3, 2019 Filing 2 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 333065615 (ao)
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Timothy J. Covington ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 333065615), filed by Phillip S. Pepper, Kaylin L. Clinton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ao)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pepper et al v. Covington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy J. Covington
Represented By: Marshall E Anders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip S. Pepper
Represented By: James J. Scanlon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaylin L. Clinton
Represented By: James J. Scanlon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?