Mericle 100 Capital, LLC v. United Sporting Companies, Inc.

Plaintiff: Mericle 100 Capital, LLC
Defendant: United Sporting Companies, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00805
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: A Richard Caputo
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mericle 100 Capital, LLC. Mericle 100 Capital, LLC served on 5/20/2019, answer due 6/10/2019. (Brier, Daniel)
June 13, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: In order that ECF may create and satisfy automatically-generated Service and Answer deadlines, Doc. #3 (Affidavit regarding Service of Summons and Complaint) in the above-captioned case should be re-filed using the proper event, "Summons Returned Executed" found in the category, "Service of Process" under the heading, "Initial Pleadings and Service".For toll-free ECF telephone support, you may call the divisionaloffice nearest to you during regular business hours:Scranton: 866-263-8479Harrisburg: 866-333-3261Williamsport: 866-736-3914 (ep)
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on United Sporting Companies, Inc. on May 20, 2019, filed by Mericle 100 Capital, LLC., ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed Acknowledgement filed by Mericle 100 Capital, LLC. (Dempsey, John)
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to United Sporting Companies, Inc. and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (ep)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United Sporting Companies, Inc. ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4756846), filed by Mericle 100 Capital, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Default Notice, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ep)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mericle 100 Capital, LLC v. United Sporting Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mericle 100 Capital, LLC
Represented By: Daniel T. Brier
Represented By: John B. Dempsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Sporting Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?