Coates v. United States Postal Service et al

Plaintiff: David R. Coates
Defendant: National Association of Letter Carriers and United States Postal Service
Case Number: 3:2019cv01005
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Robert D Mariani
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy S. Judge on behalf of United States Postal Service (Judge, Timothy)
July 16, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy L. Rosenberger on behalf of National Association of Letter Carriers (Rosenberger, Amy)
July 12, 2019 Filing 11 Letter from Kimberly D. Borland, Esq. . (Borland, Kimberly)
July 12, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David R. Coates. All Defendants. (Borland, Kimberly)
July 11, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: In order that ECF may create and satisfy automatically-generated Service and Answer deadlines, Docs. #8 and #9 in the above-captioned case should be re-filed using the proper event, "Summons Returned Executed" found in the category, "Service of Process" under the heading, "Initial Pleadings and Service".For toll-free ECF telephone support, you may call the divisionaloffice nearest to you during regular business hours:Scranton: 866-263-8479Harrisburg: 866-333-3261Williamsport: 866-736-3914 Ed PetroskiDeputy Clerk (ep)
July 10, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by David R. Coates re #2 Summons Issued as to USA, #1 Complaint Certificate of Service- William Barr Attorney General (Borland, Kimberly)
July 10, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by David R. Coates re #2 Summons Issued as to USA, #1 Complaint Certificate of Service-n Civil Process Clerk (Borland, Kimberly)
July 8, 2019 Filing 7 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Joshua J. Ellison, Esq.Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 7/8/19. (jam)
July 5, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: For purposes of special admission, Atty Joshua John Ellison's status in NY Unified Court System is "Due to reregister within 30 days of birthday Next Registration: Aug 2019 Disciplinary History: No record of public discipline " (ep)
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Joshua J Ellison on behalf of National Association of Letter Carriers Attorney Joshua Ellison is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4805139.. (Ellison, Joshua)
June 21, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by David R. Coates. (Borland, Kimberly)
June 20, 2019 Filing 4 (DOCUMENT HAS BEEN DELETED AND RE-FILED CORRECTLY UNDER DOCUMENT#5) Modified on 6/21/2019 (cl).
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. You are directed to file a written report within 30 days as to whether service has been effected or a waiver of serice obtained. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 6/17/19. (jam)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to National Association of Letter Carriers, United States Postal Service and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (ep)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against National Association of Letter Carriers, United States Postal Service ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4786603), filed by David R. Coates. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ep)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coates v. United States Postal Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Association of Letter Carriers
Represented By: Joshua J Ellison
Represented By: Amy L. Rosenberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Postal Service
Represented By: Timothy S. Judge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David R. Coates
Represented By: Kimberly D. Borland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?