Peterson v. Assure Property Development & Renovations LLC

Plaintiff: Ronald Peterson
Defendant: Assure Property Development & Renovations LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv01058
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Malachy E Mannion
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: the case management conference scheduled for today is CANCELLED. (See order for details) Case Management Conference continued until 8/27/2019 11:00 AM before Honorable Malachy E Mannion.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 8/15/19. (bs)
August 15, 2019 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Liebowitz, Richard)
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonic Appearance for Case Management Conference by Ronald Peterson.(Liebowitz, Richard) Modified on 8/7/2019 (bs).
August 6, 2019 Filing 7 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Richard Liebowitz.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 8/6/19. (bs)
August 5, 2019 Filing 6 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Richard P Liebowitz on behalf of Ronald Peterson Attorney Richard Liebowitz is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4834022., filed by on behalf of Ronald Peterson.(Liebowitz, Richard)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 8/15/2019 10:30 AM before Honorable Malachy E Mannion.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 7/23/19. (bs)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for More Definite Statement by Assure Property Development & Renovations LLC.(Sebelin, Jane) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/16/2019: #1 Proposed Order) (bs).
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 6/24/19. (bs)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Assure Property Development & Renovations LLC and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (cw)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Assure Property Development & Renovations LLC ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4795035), filed by Ronald Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Supplement)(cw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peterson v. Assure Property Development & Renovations LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Peterson
Represented By: Bruce J. Chasan
Represented By: Richard P Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assure Property Development & Renovations LLC
Represented By: Jane S. Sebelin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?