Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Smoke Rings Cigar Bar, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc., Buzzard Rock Music, Universal Music MGB NA LLC, Gold Hill Music, Inc., Fuel Publishing Inc., Counting Crows, LLC, Happ-Dog Music, Songs of Universal, Inc., Duncan Sheik Songs and Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc.
Defendant: Michael Barletta, Smoke Rings Cigar Bar, Inc., Thomas Trella and Robert Veet
Case Number: 3:2019cv01142
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Malachy E Mannion
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Filing 14 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #13 MOTION to Set Aside Default filed by Michael Barletta, Smoke Rings Cigar Bar, Inc., Thomas Trella, Robert Veet.(Logsdon, Sean)
August 14, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Set Aside Default by Michael Barletta, Smoke Rings Cigar Bar, Inc., Thomas Trella, Robert Veet. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Nonconcurrence, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Affidavit Exhibit A- Affidavit of Michael Barletta, #4 Affidavit Exhibit B- Affidavit of Robert Veet, #5 Affidavit Exhibit C- Affidavit of Thomas Trella)(Logsdon, Sean)
August 7, 2019 Filing 12 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Michael Barletta, Smoke Rings Cigar Bar, Inc., Thomas Trella, Robert Veet (ep)
August 7, 2019 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT by Broadcast Music, Inc., Buzzard Rock Music, Counting Crows, LLC, Duncan Sheik Songs, Fuel Publishing Inc., Gold Hill Music, Inc., Happ-Dog Music, Songs of Universal, Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC, Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Proposed Order)(McDermott, Ken)
July 23, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Duncan Sheik Songs, Universal Music MGB NA LLC, Fuel Publishing Inc., Buzzard Rock Music, Happ-Dog Music, Songs of Universal, Inc., Broadcast Music, Inc., Gold Hill Music, Inc., Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Counting Crows, LLC. Robert Veet served on 7/15/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (McDermott, Ken)
July 23, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Duncan Sheik Songs, Universal Music MGB NA LLC, Fuel Publishing Inc., Buzzard Rock Music, Happ-Dog Music, Songs of Universal, Inc., Broadcast Music, Inc., Gold Hill Music, Inc., Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Counting Crows, LLC. Thomas Trella served on 7/15/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (McDermott, Ken)
July 23, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Duncan Sheik Songs, Universal Music MGB NA LLC, Fuel Publishing Inc., Buzzard Rock Music, Happ-Dog Music, Songs of Universal, Inc., Broadcast Music, Inc., Gold Hill Music, Inc., Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Counting Crows, LLC. Michael Barletta served on 7/15/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (McDermott, Ken)
July 23, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Duncan Sheik Songs, Universal Music MGB NA LLC, Fuel Publishing Inc., Buzzard Rock Music, Happ-Dog Music, Songs of Universal, Inc., Broadcast Music, Inc., Gold Hill Music, Inc., Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Counting Crows, LLC. Smoke Rings Cigar Bar, Inc. served on 7/15/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (McDermott, Ken)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 7/18/19. (bs)
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Broadcast Music, Inc., Buzzard Rock Music, Counting Crows, LLC, Duncan Sheik Songs, Fuel Publishing Inc., Gold Hill Music, Inc., Happ-Dog Music, Songs of Universal, Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC, Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Vivendi SA for Songs of Universal, Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC, Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc... (McDermott, Ken)
July 5, 2019 Filing 4 Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Copyright (AO 121) mailed to Register of Copyrights. (ao)
July 5, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Michael Barletta, Smoke Rings Cigar Bar, Inc., Thomas Trella, Robert Veet and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (ao)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 EXHIBIT by Broadcast Music, Inc., Buzzard Rock Music, Counting Crows, LLC, Duncan Sheik Songs, Fuel Publishing Inc., Gold Hill Music, Inc., Happ-Dog Music, Songs of Universal, Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC, Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc. re #1 Complaint,. (ao)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4806408), filed by Duncan Sheik Songs, Universal Music MGB NA LLC, Fuel Publishing Inc., Buzzard Rock Music, Happ-Dog Music, Songs of Universal, Inc., Broadcast Music, Inc., Gold Hill Music, Inc., Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Counting Crows, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ao)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Smoke Rings Cigar Bar, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc.
Represented By: Ken J. McDermott, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Buzzard Rock Music
Represented By: Ken J. McDermott, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal Music MGB NA LLC
Represented By: Ken J. McDermott, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gold Hill Music, Inc.
Represented By: Ken J. McDermott, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fuel Publishing Inc.
Represented By: Ken J. McDermott, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Counting Crows, LLC
Represented By: Ken J. McDermott, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Happ-Dog Music
Represented By: Ken J. McDermott, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Songs of Universal, Inc.
Represented By: Ken J. McDermott, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Duncan Sheik Songs
Represented By: Ken J. McDermott, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc.
Represented By: Ken J. McDermott, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Barletta
Represented By: Sean W. Logsdon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smoke Rings Cigar Bar, Inc.
Represented By: Sean W. Logsdon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Trella
Represented By: Sean W. Logsdon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Veet
Represented By: Sean W. Logsdon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?