Gratz et al v. Gratz
Plaintiff: Jillian Gratz and Tyler Gratz
Defendant: Michael Gratz
Case Number: 3:2019cv01341
Filed: August 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Robert D Mariani
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Filing 10 BRIEF by Michael Gratz. Amendment to #7 Amended Complaint , BRIEF in Support re #9 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint , filed by Michael Gratz. Related document: #9 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Michael Gratz, #7 Amended Complaint filed by Jillian Gratz, Tyler Gratz. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Blake, Geff)
September 16, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by Michael Gratz. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Blake, Geff)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order approving Stipulatioin. Plaintiffs may file an amended complaint on or before 9/5/19. Defendant's initial response to Plaintiffs' amended complaint shall be filed on or before 9/16/19. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 9/5/19. (jam)
September 5, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Michael Gratz, filed by Jillian Gratz, Tyler Gratz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A)(Reihner, George)
September 5, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION by Jillian Gratz, Tyler Gratz. (Reihner, George)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: ORDERED that Defendant's Brief in support of his Motion to Dismiss shall be filed on or before 9/6/19. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 8/14/19. (jam)
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 Letter from Geff Blake, Esq. to Judge Mariani . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Blake, Geff)
August 5, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Michael Gratz. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Blake, Geff)
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 8/2/19. (jam)
August 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Michael Gratz from Court of Common Pleas of Lackawanna County, case number 2019-cv-4019. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 4832175), filed by Michael Gratz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) A, #3 Exhibit(s) B, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(ga)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gratz et al v. Gratz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jillian Gratz
Represented By: George A. Reihner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler Gratz
Represented By: George A. Reihner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Gratz
Represented By: Geff Blake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?