Scott v. Smoke et al
Plaintiff: Walter Scott
Defendant: CO Smoke and CO Morgan
Case Number: 3:2019cv01387
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: EBC
Referring Judge: James M Munley
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Morgan, Smoke. Morgan waiver sent on 8/29/2019, answer due 10/28/2019; Smoke waiver sent on 8/29/2019, answer due 10/28/2019. (Bowers, Anthony)
October 8, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony R. Bowers on behalf of All Defendants (Bowers, Anthony)
September 16, 2019 Filing 12 Letter from Walter Scott requesting a copy of every complaint and grievance against Officer Smoke. (kpf)
September 4, 2019 Filing 11 Waiver of Service forms (AO 398 and 399) Mailed toAtty General of PA, CO Morgan, CO Smoke with Copy of Complaint and Order dtd 9/4/19 Waiver of Service due by 10/4/2019. (ao)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DIRECTING THE CLERK'S OFFICE TO SEND AO 398 AND 399 WAIVERS FORMS to defendants. granting #2 #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; The Complaint is deemed filed. The Clerk of Court is directed to send a copy of this Order to the Superintendent/Warden of the institution wherein Pltf is presently confined. See Order for further details.Signed by Honorable James M. Munley on 9/4/19. (ao)
August 30, 2019 Filing 9 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Walter Scott. (kpf)
August 29, 2019 Filing 8 U.S. MARSHAL - 285 Form Completed by Plaintiff. (kpf)
August 29, 2019 Filing 7 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Walter Scott. (kpf)
August 29, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION (Application) to Proceed in forma pauperis by Walter Scott.(kpf)
August 12, 2019 Filing 5 THIRTY (30) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER directing the prisoner to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed. Signed by LP on 08/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 IFP (civil rights))(lp)
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 STANDING PRACTICE ORDER (Attachments: #1 285 Service Packet with IFP Notice)(aaa)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED w/ Notice & Consent Form. (aaa)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Walter Scott.(aaa)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants lodged pending the disposition of the Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Walter Scott. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(aaa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott v. Smoke et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO Smoke
Represented By: Anthony R. Bowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO Morgan
Represented By: Anthony R. Bowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?