Gomez v. Air Resources Americas, LLC
Plaintiff: Santos Gomez
Defendant: Air Resources Americas, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv01413
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Malachy E Mannion
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:203
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DISMISSING CASE Per Rule 41 without Prejudice.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 10/8/19. (bs)
October 7, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Santos Gomez (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fellerman, Gregory)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 10/8/2019 10:30 AM before Honorable Malachy E Mannion.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 9/11/19. (bs)
September 6, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint SUBJECT TO MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION, DEFENDANTS ANSWER AND DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL COMPLAINT by Air Resources Americas, LLC.(Presley, Marla)
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Andrew Dunlap.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 8/26/19. (bs)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 8/26/19. (bs)
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Santos Gomez. Air Resources Americas, LLC served on 8/16/2019, answer due 9/6/2019. (Dunlap, Andrew)
August 20, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Case assigned to Judge Mannion. (aaa)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Andrew W Dunlap on behalf of Santos Gomez Attorney Andrew Dunlap is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4846281.. (Dunlap, Andrew)
August 16, 2019 SPECIAL ADMISSION FORMS SENT to Attorney Andrew Dunlap and Attorney Richard Burch; SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM AND ECF REGISTRATION FORM sent to Attorney Josephson and Attorney Schreiber. (lg) Modified on 8/16/2019 to include Attorney Burch (lg).
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Air Resources Americas, LLC and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (ao)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Air Resources Americas, LLC ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4844682), filed by Santos Gomez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s))(ao)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gomez v. Air Resources Americas, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Santos Gomez
Represented By: Richard M. Schreiber
Represented By: Richard J Burch
Represented By: Andrew W Dunlap
Represented By: Gregory E. Fellerman
Represented By: Michael A. Josephson
Represented By: Richard M Schreiber
Represented By: Michael A Josephson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air Resources Americas, LLC
Represented By: Marla N. Presley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?