Singleton v. Warden of Lackawanna County Prison
Petitioner: Michael A. Singleton
Respondent: Warden of Lackawanna County Prison and Pennsylvania Attorney General Office
Case Number: 3:2019cv01426
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: CA
Referring Judge: Robert D Mariani
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER : ORDERED THAT: Petitioner is granted leave to withdraw the current 2254 petition without prejudice to file another 2254 petition raising all grounds for relief from his conviction. Petitioner is granted 45 days to notify the Court of his decision. See Order for full details.Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 9/23/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Election)(jam)
August 30, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Michael A. Singleton re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus(Lodged No FF and No Motion for IFP Filed), Complaint (Lodged with Motion for IFP). (ga)
August 28, 2019 Filing 8 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Michael A. Singleton. (ga)
August 28, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Michael A. Singleton.(ga)
August 23, 2019 Filing 6 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Timothy M. Betti, Warden. (ga)
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 Supplement (Entitled Brief in Support) by Michael A. Singleton. to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus(Lodged No FF and No Motion for IFP Filed), Complaint (Lodged with Motion for IFP). (ao)
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 FIFTEEN (15) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER - Within 15 days of the date of this Order, the superintendent or warden of the institution at which Petitioner is currently incarcerated is directed to provide certified copies of the statement of Petitioner's trust fund account to this Court and to the Plaintiff. The statement should reflect all activity in that account for the six-month period immediately preceding the lodging of the complaint in this action. Signed by LP on 08/16/2019. (lp)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED w/ Notice & Consent Form. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent) (lp)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael A. Singleton.(lp)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus against Warden of Lackawanna County Prison lodged pending the disposition of the Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Michael A. Singleton.(lp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Singleton v. Warden of Lackawanna County Prison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael A. Singleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden of Lackawanna County Prison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Pennsylvania Attorney General Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?