Salamone v. Midland Credit Management, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Denise Salamone
Defendant: Midland Funding, LLC and Midland Credit Management, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01431
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Robert D Mariani
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice.Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 10/11/19. (jam)
October 7, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Denise Salamone (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sabatini, Carlo)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants shall have to and including 9/9/19 by which to answer Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 8/26/19 (jam)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by Midland Credit Management, Inc., Midland Funding, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Burnette, Lauren)
August 21, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures.Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 8/21/19. (jam)
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Midland Credit Management, Inc., Midland Funding, LLC from Lackawanna County Court of Common Pleas, case number 19-cv-2420. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0314-4847150), filed by Midland Credit Management, Inc., Midland Funding, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ep)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salamone v. Midland Credit Management, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Funding, LLC
Represented By: Lauren M. Burnette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Credit Management, Inc.
Represented By: Lauren M. Burnette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Salamone
Represented By: Carlo Sabatini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?