Gannon v. State Farm Indemnity Company
Plaintiff: Susan Gannon
Defendant: State Farm Indemnity Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv01447
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Malachy E Mannion
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Approving re #9 Stipulation filed by State Farm Indemnity Company to amend complaint. It is further ordered that any claims for attys. fees and punitive damages are dismissed w/o prej. from pltf's cmp.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 10/8/19. (bs)
September 25, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION to Amend Complaint by State Farm Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Stipulated Order)(Drakas, Gary)
September 20, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by State Farm Indemnity Company. State Farm Indemnity Company waiver sent on 8/21/2019, answer due 10/21/2019. (Drakas, Gary)
September 20, 2019 Filing 7 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by State Farm Indemnity Company. (Drakas, Gary)
September 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary A. Drakas on behalf of State Farm Indemnity Company (Drakas, Gary)
September 6, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Susan Gannon. State Farm Indemnity Company served on 8/26/2019, answer due 9/16/2019. (Abrahamsen, Edwin)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 8/26/19. (bs)
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to State Farm Indemnity Company and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (kpf)
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 EXHIBIT B by Susan Gannon re #1 Complaint. (kpf) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/20/2019: #1 State Farm Policy) (jw). (Main Document 2 replaced on 8/21/2019) (kpf).
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against State Farm Indemnity Company ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4848959), filed by Susan Gannon. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kpf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gannon v. State Farm Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Gannon
Represented By: Edwin A. Abrahamsen, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Indemnity Company
Represented By: Gary A. Drakas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?