Werts et al v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Plaintiff: Donald Werts and Billie J. Werts
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01463
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Malachy E Mannion
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 11/14/2019 10:30 AM before Honorable Malachy E Mannion.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 10/11/19. (bs)
October 10, 2019 Filing 6 Defendants' Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint with Affirmative Defenses ANSWER to Complaint by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc..(Blazure, Ryan)
September 18, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. waiver sent on 8/22/2019, answer due 10/21/2019. (Blazure, Ryan)
September 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph J. Shields on behalf of All Defendants (Shields, Joseph)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 8/30/19. (bs)
August 22, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (ao)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4851482), filed by Donald Werts, Billie J. Werts. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ao)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Werts et al v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Werts
Represented By: Patrick J. Doyle, Jr.
Represented By: Kelly M. Ciravolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billie J. Werts
Represented By: Patrick J. Doyle, Jr.
Represented By: Kelly M. Ciravolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan C. Blazure
Represented By: Joseph J. Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?