Savvy Dog Systems, LLC and POM of Pennsylvania, LLC
Plaintiff: Savvy Dog Systems, LLC and POM of Pennsylvania, LLC
Defendant: PA Coin Holdings, LLC and Pennsylvania Coin, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv01470
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Robert D Mariani
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Filing 22 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #21 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by PA Coin Holdings, LLC, Pennsylvania Coin, LLC.(Gorman, John)
October 18, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by PA Coin Holdings, LLC, Pennsylvania Coin, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss)(Gorman, John)
September 23, 2019 Filing 20 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Steven G. Hill, Esq.Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 9/23/19. (jam)
September 23, 2019 Filing 19 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to John L. North, Esq.Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 9/23/19. (jam)
September 23, 2019 Filing 18 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Martha L. Decker, Esq.Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 9/23/19. (jam)
September 23, 2019 Filing 17 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Martha L Decker on behalf of POM of Pennsylvania, LLC, Savvy Dog Systems, LLC Attorney Martha Decker is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4878772.. (Decker, Martha)
September 23, 2019 Filing 16 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by John L North on behalf of POM of Pennsylvania, LLC, Savvy Dog Systems, LLC Attorney John North is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4878758.. (North, John)
September 23, 2019 Filing 15 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Steven G Hill on behalf of POM of Pennsylvania, LLC, Savvy Dog Systems, LLC Attorney Steven Hill is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4878748.. (Hill, Steven)
September 13, 2019 Filing 14 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by PA Coin Holdings, LLC. (Gorman, John)
September 13, 2019 Filing 13 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Pennsylvania Coin, LLC. (Gorman, John)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Enlargement of Time. The deadline for Defendants to move, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is hereby enlarged to and through October 18, 2019. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 9/13/19 (jam)
September 13, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE by PA Coin Holdings, LLC, Pennsylvania Coin, LLC re #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint Notice of Plaintiffs' Concurrence in Defendants' Motion for Enlargement of Time (Dkt. No. 10) (Gorman, John)
September 12, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by PA Coin Holdings, LLC, Pennsylvania Coin, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Enlargement of Time)(Gorman, John)
September 12, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by John V Gorman on behalf of PA Coin Holdings, LLC, Pennsylvania Coin, LLC (Gorman, John)
September 6, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Compaint Pennsylvania Coin, LLC served on Christopher Pisano on 8/28/2019, filed by POM of Pennsylvania, LLC, Savvy Dog Systems, LLC. (Gagne, Paul)
September 6, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint to PA Coin Holdings, LLC served on Christopher Pisano on 8/28/19, filed by POM of Pennsylvania, LLC, Savvy Dog Systems, LLC. (Gagne, Paul)
August 29, 2019 Filing 6 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Paul G. Gagne, Esq.Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 8/29/19. (jam)
August 27, 2019 Filing 5 LETTER ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. You are directed to file a written report within 30 days as to whether service has been effected or a waiver of service obtained. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 8/27/19. (jam)
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Matthew H. Haverstick on behalf of POM of Pennsylvania, LLC, Savvy Dog Systems, LLC Attorney Paul Gagne is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4853434.. (Haverstick, Matthew)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (kpf)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark by POM of Pennsylvania, LLC, Savvy Dog Systems, LLC.. (kpf)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 4852231), filed by Savvy Dog Systems, LLC, POM of Pennsylvania, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s) A, #3 Exhibit(s) B)(kpf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Savvy Dog Systems, LLC and POM of Pennsylvania, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PA Coin Holdings, LLC
Represented By: John V Gorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pennsylvania Coin, LLC
Represented By: John V Gorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Savvy Dog Systems, LLC
Represented By: Paul G. Gagne
Represented By: Matthew H. Haverstick
Represented By: Shohin Vance
Represented By: Eric J. Schreiner
Represented By: Steven G Hill
Represented By: Martha L Decker
Represented By: John L North
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: POM of Pennsylvania, LLC
Represented By: Paul G. Gagne
Represented By: Matthew H. Haverstick
Represented By: Shohin Vance
Represented By: Eric J. Schreiner
Represented By: Steven G Hill
Represented By: Martha L Decker
Represented By: John L North
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?