Blizman v. Travelers Personal Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Edith M. Blizman
Defendant: Travelers Personal Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv01539
Filed: September 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Robert D Mariani
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Brief by Edith M. Blizman. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Stipulated Order)(Cosgrove, Joseph)
October 30, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE by Travelers Personal Insurance Company re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A)(Foland, Brooks)
October 9, 2019 Filing 10 REPLY BRIEF re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Travelers Personal Insurance Company.(Foland, Brooks)
September 25, 2019 Filing 9 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Edith M. Blizman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(Cosgrove, Joseph)
September 25, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph M. Cosgrove on behalf of Edith M. Blizman (Cosgrove, Joseph)
September 12, 2019 Filing 7 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Travelers Personal Insurance Company.(Foland, Brooks)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 9/12/19 (jam)
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Travelers Personal Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Nonconcurrence)(Foland, Brooks)
September 10, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Exceed Page Limitation by Travelers Personal Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Nonconcurrence)(Foland, Brooks)
September 6, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 9/6/19. (jam)
September 5, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Travelers Personal Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Travelers Indemnity Company, Corporate Parent The Travelers Indemnity Company, Corporate Parent Travelers Property Casualty Corp., Corporate Parent Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Travelers Companies, Inc., Other Affiliate The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company for Travelers Personal Insurance Company. (ep)
September 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Travelers Personal Insurance Company from Court of Common Pleas of Luzerne County, case number 2019-10029. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0314-4863277), filed by Travelers Personal Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ep)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blizman v. Travelers Personal Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Personal Insurance Company
Represented By: Brooks R. Foland
Represented By: Allison L Krupp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edith M. Blizman
Represented By: David J. Selingo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?