Williams Field Services Company, LLC v. Greenwood et al
Plaintiff: Williams Field Services Company, LLC
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Todd E. Greenwood and James F. Greenwood
3Rd Party Defendant: Cabot Oil & Gas Corporation
Case Number: 3:2019cv01545
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: A Richard Caputo
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Filing 17 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Matthew C. Pilsner, Esq.Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 11/1/19. (dw)
October 30, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: For purposes of Special Admission, Atty Matthew Pilsner is listed on Pennsylvania Supreme Court Discplicinary Board online database as Active with no disciplinary action; (ep)
October 29, 2019 Filing 16 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Matthew C Pilsner on behalf of Cabot Oil & Gas Corporation Attorney Matthew Pilsner is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4912586.. (Pilsner, Matthew)
October 29, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE by Cabot Oil & Gas Corporation Revised Notice of Appearance (Barrette, Amy)
October 29, 2019 Filing 14 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Cabot Oil & Gas Corporation. (Barrette, Amy)
October 29, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy L. Barrette on behalf of Cabot Oil & Gas Corporation (Barrette, Amy)
October 22, 2019 Filing 12 THIRD Party Summons Issued as to Cabot Oil & Gas Corporation. (ep)
October 22, 2019 Filing 11 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Cabot Oil & Gas Corporation, THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Cabot Oil & Gas Corporation, filed by James F. Greenwood, Todd E. Greenwood.(Abrahamsen, Edwin)
October 8, 2019 Filing 10 Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses by James F. Greenwood, Todd E. Greenwood.(Abrahamsen, Edwin)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer James F. Greenwood answer due 10/10/2019; Todd E. Greenwood answer due 10/10/2019. Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 10/3/19. (dw)
October 2, 2019 Filing 8 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Unopposed by James F. Greenwood, Todd E. Greenwood. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Concurrence)(Abrahamsen, Edwin)
September 27, 2019 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Williams Field Services Company, LLC. (Kravitz, Nicholas)
September 24, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Edwin A. Abrahamsen on behalf of All Defendants. (Abrahamsen, Edwin)
September 11, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Williams Field Services Company, LLC. Todd E. Greenwood served on 9/10/2019, answer due 10/1/2019. (Kravitz, Nicholas)
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Williams Field Services Company, LLC. James F. Greenwood served on 9/10/2019, answer due 10/1/2019. (Kravitz, Nicholas)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 9/9/19. (dw)
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to James F. Greenwood, Todd E. Greenwood and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (ep)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against James F. Greenwood, Todd E. Greenwood ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4864267), filed by Williams Field Services Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Lease Agreement, #3 Exhibit B - Lease Agreement and Ramification, #4 Exhibit C - Partial Assignment and Assumption)(ep)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams Field Services Company, LLC v. Greenwood et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Williams Field Services Company, LLC
Represented By: Daniel T. Brier
Represented By: Richard L Armezzani
Represented By: Nicholas F. Kravitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Todd E. Greenwood
Represented By: Edwin A. Abrahamsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: James F. Greenwood
Represented By: Edwin A. Abrahamsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Cabot Oil & Gas Corporation
Represented By: Matthew C Pilsner
Represented By: Amy L. Barrette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?