Brown v. Finley et al
Petitioner: Jackie Lee Brown
Respondent: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA and Scott Finley
Case Number: 3:2019cv01575
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Scranton Office
Presiding Judge: EBC
Referring Judge: James M Munley
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Filing 6 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED; (ep)
September 11, 2019 Filing 5 Case transferred electronically in from District of Georgia Southern; Case Number 4:19-cv-00191. containing electronic documents.
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER transferring case to the Middle District of Pennsylvania. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 9/11/19. (wwp) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/11/2019.]
August 22, 2019 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number Sav036194. (wwp) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/11/2019.]
August 7, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing fee Deficiency by Jackie Lee Brown re #2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 8/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Blank IFP)(wwp) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/11/2019.]
August 5, 2019 Filing 2 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Jackie Lee Brown.(wwp) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/11/2019.]
August 5, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave of Court to file untimely petition for a writ of Habeas Corpus under 29 U.S.C. 2241 by Jackie Lee Brown. REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray.(wwp) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/11/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Finley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Scott Finley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jackie Lee Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?