Lough v. County of Columbia et al
Plaintiff: Justin Lough
Defendant: Deputy Warden Nye, John & Jane Does (1 - 50), Lt. Setzer, Deputy Warden Meyer, Medical Contractor/Health Provider, Warden Varano, County of Columbia, Medical Nurses Jane Does 1-5 and County Commissioners John Does 1-3 of Columbia County
Case Number: 3:2019cv01697
Filed: September 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: CA
Referring Judge: Robert D Mariani
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Deputy Warden Nye, County Commissioners John Does 1-3 of Columbia County, Lt. Setzer, County of Columbia, Warden Varano, Deputy Warden Meyer. Deputy Warden Nye waiver sent on 10/18/2019, answer due 12/17/2019; County Commissioners John Does 1-3 of Columbia County waiver sent on 10/18/2019, answer due 12/17/2019; Lt. Setzer waiver sent on 10/18/2019, answer due 12/17/2019; County of Columbia waiver sent on 10/18/2019, answer due 12/17/2019; Warden Varano waiver sent on 10/18/2019, answer due 12/17/2019; Deputy Warden Meyer waiver sent on 10/18/2019, answer due 12/17/2019. (Lavery, Frank)
November 19, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen B Edwards on behalf of County Commissioners John Does 1-3 of Columbia County, County of Columbia, Deputy Warden Meyer, Deputy Warden Nye, Lt. Setzer, Warden Varano. (Edwards, Stephen)
November 19, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Frank J. Lavery, Jr on behalf of County Commissioners John Does 1-3 of Columbia County, County of Columbia, Deputy Warden Meyer, Deputy Warden Nye, Lt. Setzer, Warden Varano. (Lavery, Frank)
November 18, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Change of Address by Justin Lough (kpf)
November 4, 2019 Filing 9 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail (Waiver Packet) sent to Deputy Warden Meyer (kpf)
October 18, 2019 Filing 8 Waiver of Service forms (AO 398 and 399) Mailed to County of Columbia, Medical Contractor/Health Provider, Deputy Warden Meyer, Deputy Warden Nye, Lt. Setzer, Warden Varano. Waiver of Service due by 11/18/2019. WAIVERS NOT SENT TO COUNTY COMMISSIONERS JOHN DOES 1-3 OF COLUMBIA COUNTY; JOHN & JANE DOES 1-50; AND MEDICAL NURSES JANE DOES 1-5.(kpf)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DIRECTING THE CLERK'S OFFICE TO SEND AO 398 AND 399 WAIVERS FORMS to defendants. ; granting #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Complaint is DEEMED filed.Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 10/17/19. (kpf)
October 15, 2019 Filing 6 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Justin Lough. (kpf)
October 15, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperisincluding certification by Justin Lough.(kpf) Modified on 10/15/2019 (lp).
October 2, 2019 Filing 4 THIRTY (30) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER directing the prisoner to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed. Signed by LP on 10/02/2019. (Attachments: #1 IFP (civil rights))(lp)
October 2, 2019 Filing 3 STANDING PRACTICE ORDER Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 02/08/2011. (Attachments: #1 0285)(lp)
October 2, 2019 Filing 2 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED w/ Notice & Consent Form. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent) (lp)
October 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants lodged as no filing fee was paid and no Motion for In Forma Pauperis was filed, filed by Justin Lough.(lp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lough v. County of Columbia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Warden Nye
Represented By: Frank J. Lavery, Jr.
Represented By: Stephen B Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John & Jane Does (1 - 50)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Setzer
Represented By: Frank J. Lavery, Jr.
Represented By: Stephen B Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Warden Meyer
Represented By: Frank J. Lavery, Jr.
Represented By: Stephen B Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Contractor/Health Provider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Varano
Represented By: Frank J. Lavery, Jr.
Represented By: Stephen B Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Columbia
Represented By: Frank J. Lavery, Jr.
Represented By: Stephen B Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Nurses Jane Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County Commissioners John Does 1-3 of Columbia County
Represented By: Frank J. Lavery, Jr.
Represented By: Stephen B Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Lough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?