Mercadante v. Chase Bank USA, N.A.
Plaintiff: William Mercadante
Defendant: Chase Bank USA, N.A.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01937
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Malachy E Mannion
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 8/1/2020. Fact Discovery due by 10/1/2020. Plaintiff Expert Report is due by 11/1/2020. Defendant Expert Report is due by 12/1/2020. Supplemental due by 12/15/2020. Expert Discovery Deadline is due by 1/15/2021. Joinder of Parties due by 8/1/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 3/1/2021. Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 12/18/19. (bs)
December 10, 2019 Filing 6 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN Joint Case Management Plan by William Mercadante. (Freeman, Brett)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 12/17/2019 11:30 AM before Honorable Malachy E Mannion.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 11/20/19. (bs)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 11/18/19. (bs)
November 15, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chase Bank USA, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co. for Chase Bank USA, N.A... (Fanaselle, Daniel)
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Chase Bank USA, N.A..(Fanaselle, Daniel)
November 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Chase Bank USA, N.A. from Lackawanna County Court of Common Pleas, case number 19-cv-5940. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 4923747), filed by Chase Bank USA, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s) A, #3 Certificate of Service)(kpf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mercadante v. Chase Bank USA, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Mercadante
Represented By: Brett M. Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Bank USA, N.A.
Represented By: Daniel C. Fanaselle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?