MENDES v. WETZEL et al
Plaintiff: MR. ADAM JOSHUA MENDES
Defendant: Officer John Doe 2, CGO- MS. D. VARNER, LIETENANT A. LITWHILER, MR. JOHN RAMSON, Officer John Doe 1, A.G.O. MS. AMANDA WEST and MR. JOHN WETZEL
Case Number: 3:2019cv02087
Filed: December 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Karoline Mehalchick
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Civil Rights (Prison Conditions)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2019 Filing 7 Case transferred electronically in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-04982 containing electronic documents. (kpf)
December 5, 2019 Original record transferred to the Middle District of Pennsylvania via interdistrict transfer system. (md) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/6/2019.]
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO TRANSFER FORTHWITH THE ABOVE CAPTIONED CASE TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA. MENDES' PETITION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (DOC. 1) SHALL BE LEFT TO THE DISCRETION OF THE TRANSFEREE COURT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 11/21/19. 11/22/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO MENDES.(rf, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/6/2019.]
November 8, 2019 Filing 5 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by ADAM JOSHUA MENDES. (mbh, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/6/2019.]
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT MR. ADAM JOSHUA MENDES'S PETITION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS #1 IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 10/29/19. 10/29/19 ENTERED AND COPY MAILED TO MENDES.(fdc) Modified on 11/6/2019 (md). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/6/2019.]
October 24, 2019 Filing 3 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (jl, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/6/2019.]
October 24, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against A.G.O. MS. AMANDA WEST, CGO- MS. D. VARNER, LIETENANT A. LITWHILER, OFFICER JOHN DOE #1, OFFICER JOHN DOE #2, JOHN RAMSON, JOHN WETZEL, filed by ADAM JOSHUA MENDES. (IFP DENIED) (Attachments: #1 CASE FORMS)(jl, ) Modified 10/29/19 (fdc). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/13/2019: #2 Exhibit) (ke, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/6/2019.]
October 24, 2019 Filing 1 ADAM JOSHUA MENDES PETITION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE..(jl, ) (Main Document 1 replaced on 11/13/2019) (ke, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/6/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MENDES v. WETZEL et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MR. ADAM JOSHUA MENDES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer John Doe 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CGO- MS. D. VARNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIETENANT A. LITWHILER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MR. JOHN RAMSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer John Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.G.O. MS. AMANDA WEST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MR. JOHN WETZEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?