Benanti v. Citizens Financial Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Michael Benanti
Defendant: Citizens Bank of PA, John Scott, Lucille, Citizens Financial Group, Inc., Other Unnamed Citizens Employees, Nicole Ferrante and Lorissa Harris
Case Number: 3:2019cv02162
Filed: December 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Karoline Mehalchick
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2020 Filing 8 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Michael Benanti. (ga)
January 21, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, including certification, by Michael Benanti.(ga) Modified on 1/28/2020 (lp).
December 27, 2019 Filing 6 FIFTEEN (15) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER - Within 15 days of the date of this Order, the superintendent or warden of the institution at which Plaintiff is currently incarcerated is directed to provide certified copies of the statement of Plaintiff's trust fund account to this Court and to the Plaintiff. The statement should reflect all activity in that account for the six-month period immediately preceding the lodging of the complaint in this action.Signed by LP on 12/27/2019. (lp) (Main Document 6 replaced on 12/27/2019) (lp).
December 27, 2019 Filing 5 THIRTY (30) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER directing the prisoner to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed. Signed by LP on 12/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 IFP (civil rights))(lp) (Main Document 5 replaced on 12/27/2019) (lp). (Main Document 5 replaced on 12/27/2019) (lp).
December 19, 2019 Filing 4 PRO SE LETTER and STANDING PRACTICE ORDER issued; (ep)
December 17, 2019 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Michael Benanti. (ep)
December 17, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael Benanti.(ep)
December 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Citizens Bank of PA, Citizens Financial Group, Inc., Nicole Ferrante, Lorissa Harris, Lucille, Other Unnamed Citizens Employees, John Scott lodged pending the disposition of the Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Michael Benanti.(ep)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Benanti v. Citizens Financial Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Benanti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citizens Bank of PA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucille
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citizens Financial Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Other Unnamed Citizens Employees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole Ferrante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lorissa Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?