Gomez v. Cabot Oil and Gas Corporation
Plaintiff: Santos Gomez
Defendant: Cabot Oil and Gas Corporation
Case Number: 3:2020cv00098
Filed: January 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Malachy E Mannion
Referring Judge: James M Munley
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:203
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2020 Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Santos Gomez, filed by Santos Gomez.(Dunlap, Andrew)
March 18, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew W Dunlap on behalf of Santos Gomez (Dunlap, Andrew)
March 18, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Gretchen W Root on behalf of Cabot Oil and Gas Corporation (Root, Gretchen)
February 25, 2020 Filing 14 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Richard Schriber.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 2/25/20. (bs)
February 25, 2020 Filing 13 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Michael Josephson.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 2/25/20. (bs)
February 25, 2020 Filing 12 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Corey S. Suda on behalf of Santos Gomez Attorney Michael A. Josephson is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-5019569.. (Suda, Corey)
February 25, 2020 Filing 11 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Corey S. Suda on behalf of Santos Gomez Attorney Richard M. Schreiber is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-5019565.. (Suda, Corey)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Approving #9 Stipulation filed by Cabot Oil and Gas Corporation deft's may respond to complaint b 3/18/20.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 2/12/20. (bs)
February 12, 2020 Filing 9 STIPULATION re #5 Affidavit of Service by Cabot Oil and Gas Corporation. (Barrette, Amy)
February 12, 2020 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Cabot Oil and Gas Corporation. (Schaffner, Curtis)
February 12, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Curtis M. Schaffner on behalf of Cabot Oil and Gas Corporation (Schaffner, Curtis)
February 12, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy L. Barrette on behalf of Cabot Oil and Gas Corporation (Barrette, Amy)
February 5, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Cabot Oil and Gas Corp on 1/27/2020, filed by Santos Gomez. (Fellerman, Gregory)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 1/23/20. (bs)
January 22, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION: This case has been assigned to Judge Malachy E. Mannion. (kpf)
January 21, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Cabot Oil and Gas Corporation and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (ao)
January 20, 2020 Filing 2 EXHIBIT by Santos Gomez re #1 Complaint. (ao)
January 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cabot Oil and Gas Corporation ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4982621), filed by Santos Gomez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ao)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gomez v. Cabot Oil and Gas Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Santos Gomez
Represented By: Richard J Burch
Represented By: Andrew W Dunlap
Represented By: Gregory E. Fellerman
Represented By: Richard M Schreiber
Represented By: Michael A Josephson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cabot Oil and Gas Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?