Owen v. Birchard et al
Plaintiff: David Owen
Defendant: DJO Holding Corp, L&D Stoneworks, Inc., Lance Birchard and Blue Stone Solutions, Co.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00200
Filed: February 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Malachy E Mannion
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 defts Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer due 5/6/20. Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 3/20/20 (bs)
March 19, 2020 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Lance Birchard, Blue Stone Solutions, Co., DJO Holding Corp, L&D Stoneworks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Campenni, Thomas)
February 28, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Sowinski, II on behalf of All Defendants. (Sowinski, Michael)
February 28, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas J. Campenni on behalf of All Defendants. (Campenni, Thomas)
February 24, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by David Owen. All Defendants. (O'Brien, Joseph)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 2/20/20. (bs)
February 5, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (kpf)
February 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 5000468), filed by David Owen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (kpf) (Main Document 1 replaced on 2/5/2020) (kpf). (Attachment 1 replaced on 2/5/2020) (kpf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Owen v. Birchard et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Owen
Represented By: William F. Dunstone
Represented By: Joseph A. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DJO Holding Corp
Represented By: Thomas J. Campenni
Represented By: Michael J. Sowinski, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L&D Stoneworks, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas J. Campenni
Represented By: Michael J. Sowinski, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lance Birchard
Represented By: Thomas J. Campenni
Represented By: Michael J. Sowinski, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Stone Solutions, Co.
Represented By: Thomas J. Campenni
Represented By: Michael J. Sowinski, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?