McGovern v. McCarthy Flowered Cabs, Inc.
Plaintiff: Kevin McGovern
Defendant: McCarthy Flowered Cabs, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00308
Filed: February 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Robert D Mariani
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin D. Salvina on behalf of Kevin McGovern (Salvina, Benjamin)
March 27, 2020 Filing 6 WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE - Attorney Edmund C Celiesius terminated on behalf of Kevin McGovern. (Celiesius, Edmund)
March 4, 2020 Filing 5 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Edmund Cellesius, Esq.Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 3/4/20. (jam)
March 3, 2020 Filing 4 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Edmund C Celiesius on behalf of Kevin McGovern Attorney Edmund Celiesius is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-5026534.. (Celiesius, Edmund)
February 26, 2020 Filing 3 LETTER ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. You are directed to file a written report within 30 days as to whether service has been effected or a waiver of service obtained. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 2/26/20. (jam)
February 20, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to McCarthy Flowered Cabs, Inc. and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (kpf)
February 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against McCarthy Flowered Cabs, Inc. (Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 5015569), filed by Kevin McGovern. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (kpf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McGovern v. McCarthy Flowered Cabs, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCarthy Flowered Cabs, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin McGovern
Represented By: Michael P Murphy
Represented By: Edmund C Celiesius
Represented By: Benjamin D. Salvina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?