Pena Grullon v. Barr et al
Plaintiff: Jose W Pena Grullon
Defendant: Simona Flores, William Pelham Barr, Secretary of Homeland Security, Board of Immigration Appeals and Warden Angela Hoover
Case Number: 3:2020cv00312
Filed: February 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: EBC
Referring Judge: Robert D Mariani
2 Judge: James M Munley
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2020 Filing 10 Waiver of Service forms (AO 398 and 399) Mailed to William Pelham Barr, Board of Immigration Appeals, Simona Flores, Angela Hoover, Secretary of Homeland Security with copy of Complaint and Waiver Order; Waiver of Service due by 5/8/2020. Copy of Complaint and Waiver Order also provided to U.S. Atty Scranton and U.S. Atty General Wash DC; (ep)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Service.In accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(c)(3), the Clerk of Court is directed to SERVE a copy of the Complaint (Doc. 1), notice of lawsuit and request to waive service of summons (form AO 398), waiver of the service of summons (form AO 399) and this Order on the named Defendants. In the interests of efficient administrative judicial economy, the Court requests that the Defendants waive service pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure. 4(d).Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 4/8/2020 (bg)
March 30, 2020 Filing 8 EMERGENCY MOTION AND REQUEST TO SERVE THE RESPONDENT BASED ON PLAINTIFF MANDATORY DETENTION filed by Jose W Pena Grullon.(pjr)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order VERBAL ORDER by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner - Case Reassigned to Honorable Robert D. Mariani. (sc)
March 9, 2020 Receipt of payment from JOSE W PENA GRULLON in the amount of $400.00 for CIVIL FILING FEE. Transaction posted on 3/6/2020. Receipt number 333070406 processed by kfuller. (tp)
March 6, 2020 Filing 7 Filing fee: $400, receipt number 333070406. Complaint is now deemed FILED. (kpf)
March 2, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED THIRTY (30) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER directing the prisoner to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed. Signed by LP on 03/02/2020. The appropriate application to proceed in forma pauperis is attached. (Attachments: #1 IFP (civil rights matter))(lp) (Main Document 6 replaced on 3/2/2020) (lp).
March 2, 2020 Filing 5 Amended PRO SE LETTER ISSUED w/ Notice & Consent Form. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent) (lp) (Main Document 5 replaced on 3/2/2020) (lp).
March 2, 2020 Filing 4 Documents Misconstrued as Habeas filed by Jose W Pena Grullon #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus(Lodged No FF and No Motion for IFP Filed). (pjr)
February 24, 2020 Filing 3 THIRTY (30) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER directing the petitioneer to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed. Signed by LP on 02/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 IFP (habeas corpus))(lp)
February 21, 2020 Filing 2 PRO SE LETTER issued; (ep)
February 20, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus lodged as no filing fee was paid and no Motion for In Forma Pauperis was filed, filed by Jose W Pena Grullon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Exhibits continued)(ep)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pena Grullon v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simona Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Pelham Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Immigration Appeals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Angela Hoover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose W Pena Grullon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?