Witmer v. Lear Corporation Pine Grove
Plaintiff: Kale Witmer
Defendant: Lear Corporation Pine Grove
Case Number: 3:2020cv00341
Filed: February 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Robert D Mariani
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2020 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Lear Corporation Pine Grove identifying Corporate Parent Lear Corporation for Lear Corporation Pine Grove. (Bocchinfuso, Jessica)
March 23, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Lear Corporation Pine Grove.(Bocchinfuso, Jessica)
March 18, 2020 Filing 6 Letter from Samuel A. Dion, Esq. Confirming service. (Dion, Samuel)
March 17, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica M Bocchinfuso on behalf of Lear Corporation Pine Grove (Bocchinfuso, Jessica)
March 16, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kale Witmer. Lear Corporation Pine Grove served on 3/2/2020, answer due 3/23/2020. (Dion, Samuel)
February 27, 2020 Filing 3 LETTER ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. You are directed to file a written report within 30 days as to whether service has been effected or a waiver of service obtained. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 2/27/20. (jam)
February 26, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Lear Corporation Pine Grove and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (ga)
February 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lear Corporation Pine Grove ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 5020398), filed by Kale Witmer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ga)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Witmer v. Lear Corporation Pine Grove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kale Witmer
Represented By: Samuel A. Dion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lear Corporation Pine Grove
Represented By: Jessica M Bocchinfuso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?