Absolute Abstract Agency, Inc. v. The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Absolute Abstract Agency, Inc.
Defendant: The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv00541
Filed: April 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Malachy E Mannion
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 6/12/2020 11:00 AM before Honorable Malachy E Mannion. This conference will be held by telephone. Counsel for the plaintiff, who is responsible for placing the conference call, shall provide the court via e-filing a call-in number in which the court may call to connect to the conference call. Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 5/1/20. (bs)
April 30, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Policy, #2 Exhibit(s) B - August 23, 2018 Letter, #3 Exhibit(s) C - January 3, 2019 Letter, #4 Exhibit(s) D - April 23, 2019 Letter, #5 Exhibit(s) E - August 21, 2019 Letter, #6 Certificate of Service)(Kelleher, Joseph)
April 27, 2020 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Peerless Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Employers Insurance Company of Wausau, Corporate Parent LMHC Massachusetts Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group Inc., Corporate Parent Ohio Casualty Corporation for The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company. (Kelleher, Joseph)
April 24, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph T. Kelleher on behalf of The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company (Kelleher, Joseph)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 4/1/20. (bs)
April 1, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (ao)
April 1, 2020 Filing 2 EXHIBITS by Absolute Abstract Agency, Inc. re #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) B, #2 Exhibit(s) C, #3 Exhibit(s) D, #4 Exhibit(s) E, #5 Exhibit(s) F, #6 Exhibit(s) G)(ao)
April 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-5052382), filed by Absolute Abstract Agency, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ao)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Absolute Abstract Agency, Inc. v. The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Absolute Abstract Agency, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph Robert Rydzewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Joseph T. Kelleher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?