Martinez v. Liberty Mutual Insurance
Plaintiff: Julizza Martinez
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance
Case Number: 3:2020cv00569
Filed: April 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Malachy E Mannion
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2020 Filing 9 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Julizza Martinez. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Law, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Proposed Order)(McGinty-Ferris, Maria)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 6/25/2020 10:30 AM before Honorable Malachy E Mannion. This conference will be held by telephone. Counsel for the plaintiff, who is responsible for placing the conference call, shall provide the court via e-filing a call-in number in which the court may call to connect to the conference call. Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 5/21/20. (bs)
May 15, 2020 Filing 7 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance.(Schenck, Edward)
May 15, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by Liberty Mutual Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Schenck, Edward)
May 7, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward A. Schenck on behalf of Liberty Mutual Insurance (Schenck, Edward)
April 7, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Maria K. McGinty-Ferris on behalf of Julizza Martinez (McGinty-Ferris, Maria)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 4/6/20. (bs)
April 6, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Liberty Mutual Insurance and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (bg)
April 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Liberty Mutual Insurance ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 5056202), filed by Julizza Martinez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez v. Liberty Mutual Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance
Represented By: Edward A. Schenck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julizza Martinez
Represented By: Brandon A. Swartz
Represented By: Maria K. McGinty-Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?