Harris v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Charles Harris
Defendant: U.S. Bureau of Prisons and United States of America
Case Number: 3:2020cv00631
Filed: April 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: CA
Referring Judge: Robert D Mariani
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2020 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to U.S. Bureau of Prisons, United States of America and provided TO U.S. MARSHAL for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 USM 285 Service Form) (ep)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DIRECTING U.S. MARSHAL TO SERVE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ; granting #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED; Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 5/19/20. cc: Warden/Superintendent to arrange and begin PLRA filing fee payments; (ep)
May 19, 2020 Filing 10 EXHIBIT by Charles Harris. (ao)
May 19, 2020 Filing 9 U.S. MARSHAL - 285 Service Forms Completed by Plaintiff. (ao)
May 19, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Charles Harris.(ao)
May 19, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFIED Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement for Charles Harris. (ao) Modified on 5/19/2020 (lp).
May 19, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION (Application) for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Charles Harris.(ao)
April 22, 2020 Filing 5 Letter dtd 4/18/20 from Charles Harris RE: Forms and REQUEST for extension of time. (ao)
April 16, 2020 Filing 4 THIRTY (30) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER directing the prisoner to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed. Signed by LP 04/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 IFP (FEDERAL TORT CLAIM))(lp)
April 16, 2020 Filing 3 STANDING PRACTICE ORDER Signed on 02/08/2011. (Attachments: #1 0285)(lp)
April 16, 2020 Filing 2 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED w/ Notice & Consent Form. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent) (lp)
April 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants lodged as no filing fee was paid and no Motion for In Forma Pauperis was filed, filed by Charles Harris.(lp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bureau of Prisons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?