Evanina et al v. The First Liberty Insurance Corporation
Plaintiff: Kathleen Evanina and Michael Evanina
Defendant: The First Liberty Insurance Corporation
Case Number: 3:2020cv00751
Filed: May 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: John E Jones
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2020 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE REPORT by Kathleen Evanina, Michael Evanina by Kathleen Evanina, Michael Evanina.(O'Donnell, Neil)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 7/30/2020 03:00 PM before Chief Judge John E. Jones III. See attached court calendar for dates that must be utilized in the JCMP when a trial term is selected. See order for call instructions.(eo)
May 22, 2020 Filing 5 RESPONSE by Kathleen Evanina, Michael Evanina to #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Defendant First Liberty Insurance Corporation on May 7, 2020 (w/Cert Serv). (O'Donnell, Neil)
May 11, 2020 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by The First Liberty Insurance Corporation. (Alford, Brigid)
May 8, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher W Woodward on behalf of The First Liberty Insurance Corporation. (Woodward, Christopher)
May 7, 2020 Filing 2 EXHIBITS 1-10 by The First Liberty Insurance Corporation re #1 Notice of Removal,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Exhibit(s) 4, #5 Exhibit(s) 5, #6 Exhibit(s) 6, #7 Exhibit(s) 7, #8 Exhibit(s) 8, #9 Exhibit(s) 9, #10 Exhibit(s) 10)(ao)
May 7, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The First Liberty Insurance Corporation from Court of Common Pleas of Lackawanna County, case number 2019-6856. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0314-5087285), filed by The First Liberty Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ao)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evanina et al v. The First Liberty Insurance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Evanina
Represented By: Neil T. O'Donnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Evanina
Represented By: Neil T. O'Donnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The First Liberty Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Brigid Q. Alford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?