KATARZYNA et al v. The Progressive Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Z.S., SIWULEC KATARZYNA and WLODZIMIERZ ROSOWSKI,
Defendant: PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE CO., PROGRESSIVE CLAIMS and The Progressive Corporation
Case Number: 3:2020cv00832
Filed: May 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Malachy E Mannion
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 8/1/2020. Fact Discovery due by 11/30/2020. Plaintiff Expert Report is due by 12/31/2020. Defendant Expert Report is due by 1/31/2021. Supplemental due by 2/28/2021.Expert Discovery Deadline is due by 3/31/2021. Joinder of Parties due by 8/1/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 2/28/2021. Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 6/29/20. (bs)
June 22, 2020 Filing 8 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE CO., PROGRESSIVE CLAIMS, The Progressive Corporation. (Dapper, Kathleen)
June 22, 2020 Filing 7 Call in Instructions for Case Management Conference on June 29, 2020 at 1:30 p.m. by SIWULEC KATARZYNA, WLODZIMIERZ ROSOWSKI,, Z.S.. #5 Scheduling Order, . (Savoia, Travis)
June 1, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer L. LeVan on behalf of The Progressive Corporation. (LeVan, Jennifer)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 6/29/2020 01:30 PM before Honorable Malachy E Mannion.This conference will be held by telephone. Counsel for the plaintiff, who is responsible for placing the conference call, shall provide the court via e-filing a call-in number in which the court may call to connect to the conference call. Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 5/29/20. (bs)
May 28, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE CO., PROGRESSIVE CLAIMS, The Progressive Corporation.(Dapper, Kathleen)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 5/21/20. (bs)
May 21, 2020 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE CO. identifying Corporate Parent The Progressive Corporation, Corporate Parent Midland Financial Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Progressive Direct Holdings, Inc. for PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE CO.. (bg)
May 21, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by PROGRESSIVE CLAIMS, The Progressive Corporation, PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE CO. from Monroe County, case number 19cv6293. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 5100001), filed by PROGRESSIVE CLAIMS, The Progressive Corporation, PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE CO.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s) A, #3 Exhibit(s) B, #4 Exhibit(s) C, #5 Exhibit(s) D, #6 Exhibit(s) E, #7 Exhibit(s) F, #8 Exhibit(s) G, #9 Exhibit(s) H, #10 Exhibit(s) I, #11 Exhibit(s) J)(bg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KATARZYNA et al v. The Progressive Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Z.S.
Represented By: Charles Bruno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SIWULEC KATARZYNA
Represented By: Charles Bruno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WLODZIMIERZ ROSOWSKI,
Represented By: Charles Bruno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE CO.
Represented By: Daniel J. Twilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PROGRESSIVE CLAIMS
Represented By: Daniel J. Twilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Progressive Corporation
Represented By: Daniel J. Twilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?