Demey v. Zuby et al
Plaintiff: Jason Demey
Defendant: Stephen A. Derenick, Taylor Borough, Pennsylvania, Michael F. Zuby and Cole Surridge
Case Number: 3:2020cv00952
Filed: June 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Christopher C Conner
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2020 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jason Demey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit C)(Ossont, Michael)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 8/31/2020 at 10:45 AM before Honorable Christopher C. Conner. SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 7/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Term. Calendar)(ktt)
July 22, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Taylor Borough, Pennsylvania, Michael F. Zuby, Stephen A. Derenick. All Defendants. (McPartland, William)
July 22, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by William J. McPartland on behalf of All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(McPartland, William)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 6/17/2020. (ktt)
June 15, 2020 Filing 4 EXHIBIT B by Jason Demey re #1 Complaint. (Ossont, Michael)
June 15, 2020 Filing 3 EXHIBIT A by Jason Demey re #1 Complaint. (Ossont, Michael)
June 12, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Stephen A. Derenick, Taylor Borough, Pennsylvania, Michael F. Zuby and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (bg)
June 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Stephen A. Derenick, Taylor Borough, Pennsylvania, Michael F. Zuby ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 5118959), filed by Jason Demey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Demey v. Zuby et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen A. Derenick
Represented By: William J. McPartland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor Borough, Pennsylvania
Represented By: William J. McPartland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael F. Zuby
Represented By: William J. McPartland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cole Surridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Demey
Represented By: Michael J. Ossont
Represented By: Jason J. Mattioli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?