Colbert et al v. Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Terrance A. Colbert and Hal H. Harris
Defendant: Debra Colucci and Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv01066
Filed: June 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: William I Arbuckle
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . IT IS ORDERED that: Plaintiffs are required to file their briefs in opposition on or before 9/8/2020. Failure to file a brief in opposition may result in Defendants' motion being deemed unopposed or the claims asserted by the non-complying Plaintiff being dismissed pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41. PLEASE SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS. Signed by Magistrate Judge William I. Arbuckle on 8/7/2020. (caw)
August 6, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT FORM SENT (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) to All Parties YOU MUST SAVE THIS FORM TO YOUR DESKTOP. THEN OPEN THE SAVED FORM AND COMPLETE THE REQUIRED SECTIONS. DO NOT FILE THIS FORM IN THE CLERKS OFFICE. THE FORM MUST BE E-MAILED TO consents@pamd.uscourts.gov OR IF YOU ARE NOT AN ECF REGISTERED USER, THEN MAIL THE FORM TO Clerks Administrative Assistant, Clerks Office, P.O. Box 1148, Scranton, PA 18501-1148. Consent Form due by 9/8/2020. (caw)
August 6, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas L Mueller on behalf of All Defendants. (Mueller, Thomas)
July 23, 2020 Filing 7 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Debra Colucci.(Stein, Bonnie)
July 23, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Debra Colucci. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Memo, #3 Exhibit(s) A, #4 Exhibit(s) B, #5 Exhibit(s) C, #6 Exhibit(s) D, #7 Exhibit(s) E, #8 Exhibit(s) F, #9 Certificate of Service)(Stein, Bonnie)
July 23, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Attorney Stein is directed to file the brief in support of the motion to dismiss as a separate document using the civil event > motions and related filings(briefs) > brief in support. Please do not refile the motion. (lg)
June 29, 2020 Receipt of payment from HAL HARRIS in the amount of $400.00 for CIVIL FILING FEE. Transaction posted on 6/25/2020. Receipt number 333071824 processed by gangeli. (jjs)
June 25, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Debra Colucci and provided TO PLTFS VIA U.S. MAIL for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (ao)
June 25, 2020 Filing 4 STANDING PRACTICE ORDER sent to Pltfs. (ao)
June 25, 2020 Filing 3 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 333071824 (ao)
June 24, 2020 Filing 2 EXHIBITS by Terrance A. Colbert, Hal H. Harris re #1 Complaint. (ao)
June 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Debra Colucci ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 333071824), filed by Terrance A. Colbert, Hal H. Harris. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ao)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Colbert et al v. Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrance A. Colbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hal H. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Colucci
Represented By: Thomas L Mueller
Represented By: Bonnie S. Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Thomas L Mueller
Represented By: Bonnie S. Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?