Gorbey
Petitioner: Michael Owl Feather Gorbey
Respondent: Warden of USP-Lewisburg
Case Number: 3:2020cv01227
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: CA
Referring Judge: Robert D Mariani
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2020 Filing 16 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #15 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Michael Owl Feather Gorbey. (kpf)
September 2, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order or Injunction to Prevent Transfer Outside of Pennsylvania Pending Resolution of Petition 28 2241 by Michael Owl Feather Gorbey. (kpf)
September 1, 2020 Filing 14 New Facts and Information by Michael Owl Feather Gorbey. #13 Brief in Support, #12 MOTION for Leave to File New Facts and Information in Relation to this Courts' 2241 Habeas Jurisdiction. (kpf)
September 1, 2020 Filing 13 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #12 MOTION for Leave to File New Facts and Information in Relation to this Courts' 2241 Habeas Jurisdiction filed by Michael Owl Feather Gorbey. (kpf)
September 1, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to File New Facts and Information in Relation to this Courts' 2241 Habeas Jurisdiction by Michael Owl Feather Gorbey. (kpf)
August 28, 2020 Filing 11 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #10 MOTION Omnibus filed by Michael Owl Feather Gorbey. (kpf)
August 28, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION Omnibus by Michael Owl Feather Gorbey. (kpf)
July 29, 2020 Filing 9 certified Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Michael Owl Feather Gorbey. (kpf) Modified on 7/29/2020 (lp).
July 27, 2020 Filing 8 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Michael Owl Feather Gorbey. (kpf)
July 17, 2020 Filing 7 FIFTEEN (15) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER - Within 15 days of the date of this Order, the superintendent or warden of the institution at which Petitioner is currently incarcerated is directed to provide certified copies of the statement of Petitioner's trust fund account to this Court and to the Petitioner. The statement should reflect all activity in that account for the six-month period immediately preceding the lodging of the complaint in this action. Order sent to Superintendent and Petitioner.Signed by LP on 07/19/2020. (lp)
July 17, 2020 Filing 6 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED w/ Notice & Consent Form. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent) (lp)
July 17, 2020 Filing 5 DECLARATION Under Penalty of Perjury filed by Michael Owl Feather Gorbey. (lp)
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for a Court Order Directing USP-Lewisburg to release Required Prisoner Trust Fund information filed by Michael Owl Feather Gorbey.(lp) Modified on 7/17/2020 (lp).
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael Owl Feather Gorbey.(lp)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in support of Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Michael Owl Feather Gorbey. (lp)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus lodged pending the disposition of the Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Michael Owl Feather Gorbey.(lp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gorbey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden of USP-Lewisburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael Owl Feather Gorbey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?