Steer Machine Tool & Die Corporation v. SS Niles Bottle Stoppers, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Steer Machine Tool & Die Corporation
Defendant: Ruth Niles and SS Niles Bottle Stoppers, LLC
Not Classified By Court: Mediator
Case Number: 3:2020cv01234
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Christopher C Conner
Referring Judge: Joseph F Saporito
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony T. Lucido on behalf of Ruth Niles, SS Niles Bottle Stoppers, LLC (Lucido, Anthony)
August 27, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge by Ruth Niles, filed by Steer Machine Tool & Die Corporation.(Carey, Brigid)
August 27, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge by SS Niles Bottle Stoppers, LLC, filed by Steer Machine Tool & Die Corporation.(Carey, Brigid)
August 27, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge by Steer Machine Tool & Die Corporation, filed by Steer Machine Tool & Die Corporation.(Carey, Brigid)
August 27, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Steer Machine Tool & Die Corporation. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Co Defendant Wavier of Service)(Carey, Brigid)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Daniel T. Brier,Daniel T. Brier for Mediator added.Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 8/4/20. (ms)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Saporito. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 8/3/2020. (ktt)
July 28, 2020 Filing 5 Joint MOTION to Reassign Case with proposed Order and Certificate of Service by Steer Machine Tool & Die Corporation.(Carey, Brigid)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures - Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 7/20/2020. (ktt)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 REPORT to Commissioner of filing or determination of an action PATENT. Sent with copy of docket sheet and complaint;
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Ruth Niles, SS Niles Bottle Stoppers, LLC and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (ep)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ruth Niles, SS Niles Bottle Stoppers, LLC ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number APAMDC-5167604), filed by Steer Machine Tool & Die Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F1, #8 Exhibit F2, #9 Exhibit F3)(ep)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steer Machine Tool & Die Corporation v. SS Niles Bottle Stoppers, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruth Niles
Represented By: Anthony T. Lucido
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SS Niles Bottle Stoppers, LLC
Represented By: Anthony T. Lucido
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steer Machine Tool & Die Corporation
Represented By: Brigid E. Carey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Mediator
Represented By: Daniel T. Brier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?