Guiffrida et al v. City of Scranton
Plaintiff: 1401 PROSPECT LLC, 212 ASH LLC, 114 PROSPECT LLC, 101 PROSPECT LLC, 821 MADISON LLC, Dinamico Corporation, 857 CAPOUSE LLC, 111 PROSPECT LLC, Adam Guiffrida, EAST SCRANTON PROPERTIES LLC, 425 COLFAX LLC, 110 PROSPECT LLC, 610 PROSPECT LLC, 643 MONROE LLC, 1326 GIBSON LLC, 106 S. MAIN LLC, 536 BEECH LLC, 1629 PITTSTON LLC and 932 CAPOUSE LLC
Defendant: City of Scranton
Case Number: 3:2020cv01455
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Christopher C Conner
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Adam Guiffrida, Dinamico Corporation. City of Scranton waiver sent on 8/19/2020, answer due 10/19/2020. (Batyko, Paul)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 8/18/2020. (ktt)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (ep)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Scranton ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number APAMDC-5209487), filed by 110 PROSPECT LLC, 1629 PITTSTON LLC, 106 S. MAIN LLC, Adam Guiffrida, EAST SCRANTON PROPERTIES LLC, 101 PROSPECT LLC, 1326 GIBSON LLC, 610 PROSPECT LLC, 212 ASH LLC, 1401 PROSPECT LLC, 932 CAPOUSE LLC, 643 MONROE LLC, Dinamico Corporation, 114 PROSPECT LLC, 536 BEECH LLC, 425 COLFAX LLC, 111 PROSPECT LLC, 821 MADISON LLC, 857 CAPOUSE LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ep)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guiffrida et al v. City of Scranton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 1401 PROSPECT LLC
Represented By: Paul George Batyko, III
Represented By: Patrick Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 212 ASH LLC
Represented By: Paul George Batyko, III
Represented By: Patrick Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 114 PROSPECT LLC
Represented By: Paul George Batyko, III
Represented By: Patrick Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 101 PROSPECT LLC
Represented By: Paul George Batyko, III
Represented By: Patrick Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 821 MADISON LLC
Represented By: Paul George Batyko, III
Represented By: Patrick Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dinamico Corporation
Represented By: Paul George Batyko, III
Represented By: Patrick Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 857 CAPOUSE LLC
Represented By: Paul George Batyko, III
Represented By: Patrick Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 111 PROSPECT LLC
Represented By: Paul George Batyko, III
Represented By: Patrick Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Guiffrida
Represented By: Paul George Batyko, III
Represented By: Patrick Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EAST SCRANTON PROPERTIES LLC
Represented By: Paul George Batyko, III
Represented By: Patrick Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 425 COLFAX LLC
Represented By: Paul George Batyko, III
Represented By: Patrick Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 110 PROSPECT LLC
Represented By: Paul George Batyko, III
Represented By: Patrick Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 610 PROSPECT LLC
Represented By: Paul George Batyko, III
Represented By: Patrick Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 643 MONROE LLC
Represented By: Paul George Batyko, III
Represented By: Patrick Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 1326 GIBSON LLC
Represented By: Paul George Batyko, III
Represented By: Patrick Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 106 S. MAIN LLC
Represented By: Paul George Batyko, III
Represented By: Patrick Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 536 BEECH LLC
Represented By: Paul George Batyko, III
Represented By: Patrick Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 1629 PITTSTON LLC
Represented By: Paul George Batyko, III
Represented By: Patrick Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 932 CAPOUSE LLC
Represented By: Paul George Batyko, III
Represented By: Patrick Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Scranton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?